ISLAMIC WELFARE TRUST UK

Charity number: 1127549
Charity reporting is overdue by 4 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 4 days
Accounts and TAR 18 June 2020 Overdue Overdue by 4 days
Annual return 18 June 2019 11 September 2020 146 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 June 2019 11 September 2020 146 days late Download
Annual return 18 June 2018 04 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 June 2018 04 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 18 June 2017 07 June 2018 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 June 2017 07 June 2018 50 days late Download
Annual return 18 June 2016 07 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 June 2016 07 April 2017 On time Download