ISLAMIC WELFARE TRUST UK

Charity number: 1127549
Charity reporting is overdue by 4 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
18/06/2015 18/06/2016 18/06/2017 18/06/2018 18/06/2019
Total gross income £158.07k £184.26k £164.95k £287.31k £156.92k
Total expenditure £159.98k £188.34k £144.16k £210.36k £147.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A