GURU NANAK GURDWARA AND SIKH CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1131137
Charity reporting is overdue by 30 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 30 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 April 2019 154 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 03 April 2019 154 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 January 2018 90 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 January 2018 90 days late Download