GURU NANAK GURDWARA AND SIKH CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1131137
Charity reporting is overdue by 36 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £63.68k £50.00k £41.41k £57.72k £112.36k
Total expenditure £46.09k £49.24k £45.03k £42.18k £192.92k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £378 £0 £0 N/A £40.00k