GURU NANAK GURDWARA AND SIKH CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity number: 1131137
Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KASHMIR SINGH Trustee 15 June 2012 None on record
PARMINDER SINGH CHEEMA Trustee 15 June 2012 None on record
SANTOKH SINGH GARCHA Trustee 15 June 2012 None on record
SUKDEV SINGH Trustee 28 November 2012 None on record
KAKA SINGH Trustee 01 November 2019 None on record
PRITPAL SINGH Trustee 06 July 2012 None on record
MANJIT SINGH Trustee 06 July 2012 None on record
SOHAN SINGH GREWAL Trustee None on record
JOGINDER SINGH KULLAR Trustee 17 November 2011 None on record