THE SKINNERS' ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 1127772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £1.04m £1.23m £1.47m £1.21m £1.22m
Total expenditure £929.21k £996.08k £1.09m £978.26k £927.16k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £50.00k £50.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £12.56k £359.15k £255.37k £2.27k £1.58k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £882.64k £985.38k £999.53k £1.00m £1.03m
Income - Endowments £0 £322.91k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £149.20k £152.80k £215.95k £211.94k £185.78k
Income - Other £0 £52.59k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £920.44k £972.58k £1.09m £978.26k £927.16k
Expenditure - Raising funds £8.77k £23.50k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.77k £8.74k £8.90k £9.08k £9.08k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0