SAI TRUST

Charity number: 1130577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 28 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 22 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 22 June 2016 On time Download