SAI TRUST

Charity number: 1130577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £109.30k £87.05k £47.80k £47.76k £42.30k
Total expenditure £110.63k £76.40k £55.79k £47.11k £43.19k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A