SAI TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hold community get togethers where prayers are carried out and food servings are provided.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 July 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VIKI PATEL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
NAIMISHA PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NIKITA PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.30k | £25.09k | £31.90k | £42.37k | £39.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £43.19k | £18.71k | £17.76k | £42.58k | £28.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 AUGUST 2008
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION INCLUDING RELIGIOUS AND SPIRITUAL EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ESPECIALLY CHILDREN AND YOUNG IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BALING AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS, IN HUMAN VALUES PROGRAMMES BASED ON TEACHINGS INITIATED BY THE GURU KNOWN AS SHRI SAI BABA 2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP PARTICULARLY OF THE ELDERLY, SICK, INFIRM OR PERSONS SUFFERING FROM POVERTY BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE 3) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF EALING AND SURROUNDING DISTRICTS THROUGH THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL -WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS
Area of benefit
BALING
Contact information
- Address:
-
1496 GREENFORD ROAD
GREENFORD
UB6 0HP
- Phone:
- 02084221130
- Email:
- nikitaviki@hotmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window