Accounts and annual returns THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN - BOURNEMOUTH COASTAL AREA QUAKER MEETING

Charity number: 1134540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 18 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

09 September 2017 On time Download Open in new window