ACTASIA

Charity number: 1127625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £123.12k £162.02k £65.48k £155.05k £147.99k
Total expenditure £125.47k £146.53k £88.84k £144.75k £119.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A