THE IRENE NEWMAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1127940
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 October 2019 13 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 27 October 2018 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 27 October 2017 13 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2017 Not Required
Annual return 27 October 2016 16 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2016 Not Required
Annual return 27 October 2015 28 October 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 27 October 2015 Not Required