EMMANUEL EVANGELICAL CHURCH NORTH LONDON LIMITED

Charity number: 1128397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2020 09 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 09 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2019 04 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 04 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2018 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 30 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 04 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 04 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 October 2016 14 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 14 July 2017 On time Download