EMMANUEL EVANGELICAL CHURCH NORTH LONDON LIMITED

Charity number: 1128397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £78.86k £119.10k £58.97k £115.18k £139.35k
Total expenditure £78.11k £78.69k £81.01k £83.08k £132.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A