SHANTHONA WOMEN'S GROUP

Charity number: 1133117
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 February 2017 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required