FRIENDS OF ISRAEL EMERGENCY AID FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provide assistance to members of public in Israel in a time of need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Barnet
- Israel
Governance
- 15 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
elliott unsdorfer | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 332 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 698 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 March 2022 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 AUGUST 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 5 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS IN THE ABSOLUTE DISCRETION AND OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES SHALL PROMOTE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE OF ISRAEL, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: I THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EMERGENCY HELP, TRAINING, SUPPORT, ADVICE AND THE PROVISION OF A VOLUNTARY AMBULANCE TRANSPORT SERVICES, FIRST AID AND FIRST RESPONSE SERVICE II THE RELIEVE OF POVERTY, DISTRESS, SUFFERING, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS OF VICTIMS OF WAR, CIVIL DISTURBANCE, TERRORISM, VIOLENT CONFLICT, NATURAL DISASTER OR ANY EMERGENCY AND FURTHER, THE PROMOTION OF ANY OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES SUCH AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, PROVIDED THAT THEY ARE REGARDED AS CHARITABLE BY THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
ISRAEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARKGATE ASPEN
WILBERFORCE HOUSE
STATION ROAD
LONDON
NW4 4QE
- Phone:
- 02082030436
- Email:
- ELLIOTTAU@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window