THE OUTWARD BOUND TRUST

Charity number: 1128090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £16.81m £15.63m £21.04m £16.18m £13.19m
Total expenditure £14.86m £14.23m £15.31m £16.13m £13.61m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £244.00k £111.79k £100.00k £75.00k £2.65m
Income - Donations and legacies £6.53m £5.96m £10.45m £5.19m £7.36m
Income - Other trading activities £3.96m £3.75m £4.30m £4.37m £2.00m
Income - Charitable activities £6.29m £5.89m £6.23m £6.50m £3.76m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £34.28k £22.50k £64.92k £122.93k £70.46k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £27.80k £244.39k £50.50k £178.59k £1.20m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £10.11m £10.16m £10.74m £11.42m £9.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.69m £1.76m £1.87m £2.04m £1.51m
Expenditure - Governance £50.15k £0 £0 £0 £27.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £3.06m £2.31m £2.70m £2.67m £2.26m