THE FRAGILE X SOCIETY

Charity number: 1127861
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2020 23 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 23 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2019 20 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 20 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2018 09 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 09 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 25 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2016 19 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 19 September 2016 On time Download