DAGENHAM UMMAH WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the trust shall be to help the local community of Dagenham and the surrounding areas: 1. for the advancement of the religion of Islam in accordance with the tenets and doctrines of the Hanafi Sunni Sect of Islam; 2. to advance the Islamic religion in Dagenham and surrounding areas for the benefit of the public, through the holding of prayer meetings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barking And Dagenham
Governance
- 30 June 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMAD AZIBUR RAHMAN | Trustee | 02 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
IRFAN PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MOHAMMED MOBRUR AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.49k | £53.77k | £70.84k | £95.69k | £49.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.98k | £28.58k | £65.22k | £73.60k | £62.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.06k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 February 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 March 2023 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 March 2023 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 213 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 213 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 3 JUNE 2010
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF CLASSES AND SUPPLEMENTARY COURSES IN TOPICS SUCH AS THE HOLY QURAN AND MOTHER TONGUES CLASSES TO THE ISLAMIC COMMUNITY AS NEEDED. 2) TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION IN DAGENHAM AND SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND PRODUCING AND /OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. 3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND UNEMPLOYMENT BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, ASSISTANCE AND INFORMATION. 4) FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
DAGENHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 HEWETT ROAD
DAGENHAM
RM8 2XT
- Phone:
- 07476572279
- Email:
- duwt@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
duwt.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window