Accounts and annual returns SOUTH SINAI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1128955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 13 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 15 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 25 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window