Financial history SOUTH SINAI FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1128955
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £19.80k £20.20k £26.16k £25.88k £35.61k
Total expenditure £22.36k £15.31k £25.36k £22.02k £23.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A