Accounts and annual returns UGANDA HUMANIST SCHOOLS TRUST (UK)

Charity number: 1128762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 August 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 01 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 25 April 2017 On time Download Open in new window