Trustees UGANDA HUMANIST SCHOOLS TRUST (UK)

Charity number: 1128762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Steve Hurd BSc, MA, PGCE, FRSS Chair
None on record
Lee James Denison M.Eng Trustee 16 September 2020
None on record
Derek John Miller LL.B Trustee 15 February 2020
MADELEY RURAL COMMUNITY CHARITY
Received: On time
Krystal Sno White BA,MAT Trustee 07 February 2020
None on record
GLENDA MILLER B.A.Hons Trustee 07 September 2016
None on record
PAUL EWANS MA Trustee 15 April 2014
THE BATH HOUSE ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
Chris Smith BSc, PGCE Trustee 15 April 2014
None on record
PROFESSOR HILARY HURD Trustee
MADELEY AND DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)
Received: On time
DANIEL HURD BS, ACA Trustee
None on record