REVIVAL HOUSE

Charity number: 1128439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £88.71k £137.66k £170.06k £167.21k £192.81k
Total expenditure £82.25k £127.81k £160.32k £171.45k £202.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A