Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE COLLEGIATE CHURCH OF ST MARY, WARWICK

Charity number: 1128087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £334.76k £432.98k £492.04k £437.13k £671.30k
Total expenditure £774.21k £467.77k £489.63k £414.91k £694.96k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £537.81k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.20k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £36.65k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.24k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £78.41k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £693.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.11k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0