ST ANTHONYS PROJECT FOR HOMELESS ADDICTS

Charity number: 1128362
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £78.25k £68.67k £66.24k £62.78k £62.89k
Total expenditure £68.45k £63.21k £58.17k £62.21k £61.21k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A