UNITED KINGDOM ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURY FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to promote understanding of all aspects of acquired brain inury to educate, inform and provide networking opportunities for professionals, service providers, planners and policy makers in all areas of acquired brain injury to raise the profile of acquired brain injury and campaign for better services in the UK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 February 2009: Standard registration
- 04 November 2021: Funds received from 1155492 INJURY ADVICE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Alyson Louise Norman | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Martin QC | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Dilley | Trustee | 04 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr Michael J Grey | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sam Shephard | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Piercy | Trustee | 14 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julian Harriss | Trustee | 13 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Professor Andrew Bateman | Trustee | 13 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Peter Freeman | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
LISA TURAN | Trustee | 19 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA SWAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIKE HOPE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.50k | £63.23k | £100.38k | £147.18k | £159.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.66k | £93.89k | £77.46k | £157.77k | £159.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/06/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO THE EXTENT THAT SUCH OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND PROVIDED THAT THE OBJECTS SHALL ALWAYS BE SOLELY AND EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE, THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE: 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, IN THE SUBJECT OF CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURY, OF 3.1.1 THE PROVIDERS OF SERVICES FOR PEOPLE WITH ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURY; 3.1.2 PEOPLE WITH ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURY AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; AND 3.1.3 THE COMMUNITY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS A WHOLE 3.2 THE RELIEF OF DISABILITY OF PEOPLE WITH ACQUIRED BRAIN INJURY BY EDUCATION RATHER THAN AS A PROVIDER OF DIRECT SERVICES.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Capital Office
124-128 City Road
LONDON
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 03456070788
- Email:
- info@ukabif.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window