Financial history WOMEN IN INFORMAL EMPLOYMENT: GLOBALIZING AND ORGANIZING (WIEGO) LIMITED

Charity number: 1143510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.68m £6.86m £4.37m £8.38m £25.23m
Total expenditure £3.03m £5.27m £5.64m £5.36m £7.84m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £290.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.26m £301.62k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.91k £392 £0 £1.45k £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.67m £6.83m £4.36m £8.38m £25.22m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6.15k £35.41k £17.06k £2.67k £9.02k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.94m £5.19m £5.64m £5.21m £7.84m
Expenditure - Raising funds £95.31k £82.44k £0 £150.00k £0
Expenditure - Governance £78.56k £231.00k £0 £48.76k £106.15k
Expenditure - Grants institution £40.73k £667.64k £844.36k £711.38k £1.60m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0