ETHIOPIA EDUCATION AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of young people in Ethiopia by: a) the advancement of education and training b) the relief of poverty, sickness and distress c) the promotion of good health d) the advancement of the Christian faith
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Devon
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 01 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN MARGARET CLARKE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Yohannes Tadesse | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Burton | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GRANTLEY PHIPPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET ANNE PHIPPS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAURICE RICHARD CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.21k | £23.20k | £24.71k | £12.85k | £12.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.11k | £14.50k | £30.78k | £13.38k | £12.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ETHIOPIA BY : A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS C) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH D) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH
Area of benefit
ETHIOPIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAKFIELD
DARTINGTON
TOTNES
TQ9 6DH
- Phone:
- 01803864158
- Email:
- msclarke@globalnet.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window