Accounts and annual returns THE TONY BLAIR GOVERNANCE INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1132422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 01 July 2022 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 19 May 2021 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 24 January 2020 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 28 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 28 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2017 23 February 2018 57 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 23 February 2018 57 days late Download Open in new window