Financial history THE TONY BLAIR GOVERNANCE INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1132422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £6.71m £1.90m £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £8.77m £1.93m £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.17m £1.89m N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £1.46m £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £5.00k £8.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £78.00k £3.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.39m £1.93m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £381.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £53.00k £102.00k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £1.73m N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A