DHANYAL WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 1129618
Charity reporting is overdue by 1033 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 302 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 302 days
Annual return 01 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 668 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 668 days
Annual return 01 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1033 days
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1033 days
Annual return 01 April 2017 03 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 01 April 2016 08 April 2017 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2016 Not Required