NORTH WEST LONDON AREA QUAKER MEETING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The furtherance of the general religious and charitable purposes of the Religious Society of Friends (Quakers) in Britain in the area of North West London Area Quaker Meeting and beyond.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
149 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Barnet
- Camden
- Haringey
Governance
- 26 February 2010: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy John Heath | Chair | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Rafael Duran | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Jones | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Claire Farrier | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
David Kimmett Edgar | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Andrew Shinebourne | Trustee | 17 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS LOVEDAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.61k | £100.07k | £88.11k | £85.01k | £82.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.42k | £88.31k | £81.54k | £89.02k | £103.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 SEPTEMBER 2007 as amended on 27 Mar 2019 as amended on 27 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE GENERAL RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS) IN BRITAIN IN THE AREA OF THE NORTH WEST LONDON MEETING AND BEYOND
Area of benefit
NORTH WEST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 The Orchard
LONDON
NW11 6YN
- Phone:
- 07910673114
- Email:
- clerknwlondon@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window