GLYNDON COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity number: 1129931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £251.93k £277.39k £256.46k £258.55k £225.39k
Total expenditure £252.66k £253.91k £272.57k £266.15k £264.55k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £81.00k £84.62k £81.00k £81.00k £65.00k