DADA NORTH EAST (DEAF, AUTISTIC, DISABLED, ADVOCACY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hartlepool
Governance
- 08 April 2009: Standard registration
- 06 October 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DADA (Working name)
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DEAF DISABLED AND AUTISTIC PEOPLE IN HARTLEPOOL THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SERVICES INCLUDING COUNSELLING, ADVOCACY, TRAINING IN THE USE OF BRITISH SIGN LANGUAGE, ADVICE AND INFORMATION, TO ENABLE THEM TO LIVE AS INDEPENDENTLY AS POSSIBLE.
Area of benefit
HARTLEPOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window