Financial history THE FRIENDS OF ROMSEY ABBEY

Charity number: 1134191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £18.49k £88.83k £15.93k £5.54k £12.50k
Total expenditure £13.94k £14.33k £19.93k £10.63k £9.31k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A