Accounts and annual returns THE TESSA SANDERSON FOUNDATION AND ACADEMY

Charity number: 1131781
Charity reporting is overdue by 253 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 253 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Overdue Overdue by 253 days
Annual return 31 January 2020 17 May 2021 168 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 25 January 2020 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 25 January 2020 421 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 11 December 2017 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 December 2017 11 days late Download Open in new window