Financial history THE TESSA SANDERSON FOUNDATION AND ACADEMY

Charity number: 1131781
Charity reporting is overdue by 261 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £123.00k £63.00k £16.00k £15.25k £78
Total expenditure £122.83k £66.98k £12.24k £11.93k £78
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A