Accounts and annual returns ASKAM AND IRELETH COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1128682
Charity reporting is overdue by 173 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 173 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 09 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 02 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 11 February 2021 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 10 February 2021 410 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required