THE UROLOGY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1128683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.19m £836.31k £721.27k £877.05k £1.43m
Total expenditure £1.34m £1.36m £798.41k £917.54k £1.23m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.13m £668.16k £404.63k £429.69k £1.37m
Income - Other trading activities £44.91k £149.73k £298.97k £427.98k £64.92k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17.40k £18.42k £17.67k £19.38k £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £49.00k £1.00k £0 £653
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.24m £1.22m £639.44k £769.76k £1.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £98.22k £145.25k £158.97k £147.78k £74.84k
Expenditure - Governance £3.97k £4.56k £4.96k £4.79k £3.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £1.06m £1.03m £319.13k £407.46k £909.34k
Expenditure - Investment management £19.66k £21.87k £21.17k £17.56k £365
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0