Governance THE UROLOGY FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1128683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 19 March 2009: Standard registration
- 10 June 2015: Funds received from 287406 RALPH SHACKMAN TRUST
- 29 March 2019: Funds received from 1144937 HW ABBOTT WILL TRUST
- 20 September 2022: Funds received from 1080542 THE MALCOLM COPTCOAT MEMORIAL TRUST
- 10 October 2023: Funds received from 296399 THE ST MARY'S HOSPITAL UROLOGICAL RESEARCH AND EDU...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
No other names
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.