THE UROLOGY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1128683
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Fletcher Chair 06 March 2019 None on record
Tim O'Brien Trustee 20 September 2020 None on record
Roland Morley Trustee 10 October 2016
UNITED KINGDOM CONTINENCE SOCIETY Recently registered
Mark Becker Trustee 07 November 2016 None on record
ADRIAN JOYCE Trustee 07 November 2016 None on record
Ben Challacombe Trustee 07 November 2016 None on record
Professor Krishna Kumar Sethia Trustee 04 October 2015
BJU INTERNATIONAL Received: On time
PROFESSOR GRANT DUNCAN STEWART Trustee 11 May 2018
SELWYN COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE Received: On time
Angela Daniel Trustee 19 October 2018 None on record
Hannah Warren Trustee 23 January 2021 None on record
Mr David Nicol Trustee 07 November 2016 None on record
Mary Garthwaite Trustee 23 January 2021 None on record