THE SEABY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 November 2019 24 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 13 November 2019 24 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 13 November 2018 24 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 13 November 2018 24 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 13 November 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 13 November 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 13 November 2016 05 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 13 November 2016 05 January 2017 On time Download
Annual return 13 November 2015 09 December 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 13 November 2015 09 December 2015 On time