THE SEABY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1129062
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
13/11/2015 13/11/2016 13/11/2017 13/11/2018 13/11/2019
Total gross income £81.69k £91.33k £87.67k £89.64k £51.54k
Total expenditure £80.61k £82.78k £91.04k £88.77k £90.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A