Accounts and annual returns ANIMALS IN SCIENCE - EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1133119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 05 July 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 01 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 26 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window