Financial history ANIMALS IN SCIENCE - EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1133119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £35.53k £32.87k £12.91k £29.95k £26.60k
Total expenditure £42.00k £34.76k £11.56k £24.26k £16.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A