THE VICTORIA CLIMBIE FOUNDATION UK

Charity number: 1128786
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £10.74k £9.54k £6.37k £12.97k £31.01k
Total expenditure £12.38k £9.96k £6.90k £12.17k £29.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A