EXETER FOOD BANK

Charity number: 1128795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £33.81k £60.20k £121.62k £62.37k £191.37k
Total expenditure £34.88k £34.87k £37.79k £48.13k £63.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £7.16k N/A N/A