BELVOIR CRICKET & COUNTRYSIDE TRUST

Charity number: 1131442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 07 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 05 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

05 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 05 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2017 28 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 28 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2016 06 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 06 February 2017 On time Download