SOUTH BUCKS HOSPICE

Charity number: 1128881
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.99m £1.90m £1.77m £2.02m £1.59m
Total expenditure £1.89m £1.90m £2.13m £1.66m £1.63m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £65.49k £0 N/A N/A £79.79k
Income - Donations and legacies £425.70k £629.44k £569.52k £848.80k £570.48k
Income - Other trading activities £1.36m £1.27m £1.20m £1.17m £1.01m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £203.17k £5.15k £1.79k £3.05k £2.22k
Income - Other £292 £492 £245 £870 £7.43k
Income - Legacies £21.47k £28.77k £73.07k £184.21k £41.32k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £442.98k £501.03k £777.92k £718.87k £731.79k
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.44m £1.40m £1.35m £945.71k £893.21k
Expenditure - Governance £10.08k £20.03k £15.67k £16.15k £17.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0